SC S0987 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 23-35-175, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Discharge Of Fireworks And Certain Terms And Their Definitions, So As To Revise The Definition Of The Term "fireworks Prohibited Zone" To Include Any Public Beach Or Public Beach Access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Goldfinch, McLeod, Senn, Rice
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2335175(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback