SC S0978 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 191
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 191
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Provisions Of Section 38-87-30 To A Risk Retention Group Licensed As A Captive Insurance Company
Title
Risk-based capital plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Act No. 191 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date 01/01/17 | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 194 | |
2016-05-18 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2016-05-17 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 87 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 87 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 9 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 90 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |