SC S0961 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 39-25-20(t) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Definition Of "honey", To Provide That Beekeepers Producing No More Than Four Hundred Gallons Of Honey May File For An Exemption From Inspections And Regulations Requiring Honey To Be Processed, Extracted, And Packaged In An Inspected Food Processing Establishment, Or From Being Required To Obtain A Registration Verification Certificate From The Department Of Agriculture; And To Provide That Beekeepers Who File For And Obtain The Exemption Certificate From The Department Of Agriculture May Sell Directly To Inspected Food Processing Establishments That Maintain A Registration Verification Certificate For Subsequent Wholesale Or Resale Sales.
Title
Honey
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Senn [R] | Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] |
Sen. Michael Fanning [D] | Sen. Joshua Kimbrell [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4854 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs