SC S0922 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Read third time and sent to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The 1976 South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 58-27-1060, So As To Provide When A Person Or Corporation Using An Electric Vehicle Charging Station Is Not An Electric Utility, And To Further Provide That Any Increase In Customer Demand Or Energy Consumption Associated With Transportation Electrification Shall Not Constitute Revenues For An Electrical Utility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric charging stations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-03-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Climer, Goldfinch
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58271060(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback