SC S0919 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Overpass Of Harrelson Boulevard In Horry County "patrolman Jacob Hancher Overpass" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Patrolman Jacob Hancher Overpass
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Ronnie Sabb [D] |
Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-05-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-05-04 | House | Introduced |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |