SC S0909 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-10-108 So As To Provide Circumstances In Which Professional Employer Organizations May Be Eligible For Certain Tax Credits And Economic Incentives Under The Enterprise Zone Act Of 1995; By Adding Section 40-68-145 So As To Provide For The Determination Of Tax Credits And Economic Incentives Based On Employment With Respect To Client Companies Of Professional Employer Organizations; To Amend Section 40-68-55, Relating To The Ability Of The Department Of Insurance To Regulate The Acceptance Of Affidavit Or Certification Of Approval Of Qualified Assurance Organizations, So As To Delete The Requirement That These Functions Be Provided By Regulation; To Amend Section 40-68-60, Relating To The Requirements Of Professional Employment Organization Services Agreements Between Professional Employer Organizations And Assigned Employees, So As To Provide Organizations Shall Provide Assigned Employees With Certain Written Notice Of How The Agreement Affects Them; To Amend Section 40-68-70, Relating To The Requirements Of Professional Employment Organization Services Agreements Between Professional Employer Organizations And Client Companies, So As To Provide That The Terms Of The Agreement Must Be Established By Written Contract; And To Amend Section 40-68-150, Relating To Certain Prohibited Acts, So As To Provide Professional Employer Organizations Shall Not Engage In The Sale Of Insurance Or Act As Third Party Administrators, And To Provide That The Sponsoring And Maintaining Of Employee Benefit Plans For The Benefit Of Assigned Employees Does Not Constitute The Sale Of Insurance.
Title
Professional employer organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 10 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 68 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 68 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 68 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 68 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 68 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |