SC S0854 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Member Is Considered To Be In Service On The Date The Application For Disability Retirement Is Filed If The Last Day The Member Was Employed In The System Occurred Not More Than One Year Before The Date Of Filing.
Title
Disability retirement for members of SC retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 1540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 11 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 9 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |