SC S0836 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 124 Of 1969, As Amended, Relating To The Creation Of The School District Of Union County, So As To Require The School District Of Union County To Recognize Memorial Day As A Holiday And All District Schools And Offices Must Be Closed On That Date. - Ratified Title
Title
Local Government - Memorial Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Override Veto By The Governor (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Act No. 263 | |
2022-02-15 | Effective date 02/09/22 | |
2022-02-09 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-92 Nays-1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2022-02-01 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-01-26 | Ratified R 120 | |
2022-01-11 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-06-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2021-06-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-06-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |