SC S0834 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The Surrender Of A Driver's License By A Person Convicted Of Certain Crimes, To Amend The Definition For A Crime Of Violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-03HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-28SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2018-03-28SenateRead second time
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561146(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback