SC S0818 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 178 From Its Intersection With The Orangeburg/dorchester County Line To Its Intersection With United States Highway 15 "councilman Willie Richard Davis Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Councilman Willie Richard Davis Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |