SC S0799 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name A Portion Of Interstate-85 In Anderson And Oconee County "christina Adams Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Christina Adams Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |