SC S0797 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Highway 1 From Its Intersection With I-20 To Highway 78 (richland Avenue) In Aiken County "veterans Memorial Highway", Name The Portion Of Highway 25 From The Edgefield County Line To The North Augusta City Limits In Aiken County "veterans Highway", Name The Portion Of Highway 78 (richland Avenue) From Its Intersection With Highway 1 (york Street) East To The Aiken County Line In Aiken County "gold Star Families Memorial Highway", And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At These Locations Containing The Designations.
Title
Veterans Memorial Highway named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |