SC S0758 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Period For Waterfowl Hunting On Department Of Natural Resources Leased Premises On The Lake
Title
Waterfowl hunting on Lake Blalock
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Reese [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 190 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 208 | |
2018-05-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |