SC S0716 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-530, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In York County, So As To Add The Crescent And Hands Mill Voting Precincts, And To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
York County, voting precincts
Sponsors
Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Act No. 93 | |
2021-07-12 | Effective date 6/24/21 | |
2021-06-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-06-21 | Ratified R 114 | |
2021-06-21 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-06-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2021-06-09 | House | Read second time |
2021-06-09 | House | Delegation report: Favorable York Delegation |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to York Delegation |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |