SC S0701 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name A Portion Of Highway 45 From Betaw Road Extending 1.5 Miles To Arrowhead Turn "harvey Middleton Road" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Harvey Middleton Road
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Sabb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced |
2021-03-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |