SC S0699 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fix Wednesday, May 5, 2021, At Noon As The Date And Time For The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Meet In Joint Session In The Hall Of The House Of Representatives To Elect One Member Of The Legislative Audit Council, At-large, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2027; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University From The Second Congressional District, Seat 2, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2025; A Member From The Fourth Congressional District, Seat 4, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2025; From The Sixth Congressional District, Seat 6, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2025, And Members, At-large, From Seats 8, 10, 12, 14, And 15, Respectively, All For Terms To Expire June 30, 2025; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Winthrop University, At-large, Seat 10, For A Term To Expire June 30, 2027; To Elect One Member To The Commission Of The Old Exchange Building, At-large, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2027; And To Elect Four Members, At-large, Of The Board Of Trustees Of The Wil Lou Gray Opportunity School, All For Terms To Expire June 30, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint assembly for elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
2021-03-31SenateAdopted, sent to House
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable Operations and Management
2021-03-31SenatePolled out of committee Operations and Management
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Committee on Operations and Management
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback