SC S0698 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]

Summary

Approve Regulations Of Clemson University, Relating To Parking, Traffic, And Public Safety Regulations, Designated As Regulation Document Number 5108, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The South Carolina Code Of Laws. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clemson - JR to Approve Regulation Doc No. 5108

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06 Act No. 102
2023-07-06 Effective date 05/16/23
2023-05-16 Signed By Governor
2023-05-11 Ratified R 41
2023-05-05HouseRead third time and enrolled
2023-05-04HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2023-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2023-05-04HouseRead second time
2023-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures
2023-04-19HouseReferred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
2023-04-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-04-18SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-04-13SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2023-04-13SenateRead second time
2023-04-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-30SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback