SC S0698 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Use Of Certain Funds From The Warehouse Receipts Guaranty Fund To Pay Certain Cotton Producer Claims, To Provide That The Cotton Producer Shall Subrogate His Interest In A Cause Of Action, And To Provide For The Return Of Certain Funds To The Warehouse Receipts Guaranty Fund. - Ratified Title
Title
Cotton Producer Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 97 | |
2021-04-21 | Effective date 04/16/21 | |
2021-04-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Ratified R 24 | |
2021-04-08 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |