SC S0697 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-43-400 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Jurisdiction Of A Coroner Over A Body That Is The Subject Of An Anatomical Gift, To Clarify That The Coroner Must Cooperate Expeditiously With A Procurement Organization To Maximize The Opportunity To Recover Anatomical Gifts For The Purpose Of Transplantation, Therapy, Research, Or Education, Even When Performing An Investigation.
Title
Coroner, jurisdiction over body subject to anatomical gift
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |