SC S0696 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Seek To Destigmatize Substance Use Disorder, Share Real Stories Of Hope And Recovery, And Inspire Lexington County Residents To Seek Help And Support By Choosing #courageoverstigma.
Title
Senate Concurrent-The Courage Center and substance abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |