SC S0677 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-2-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Tax Credits, So As To Provide For The Allocation Of A Tax Credit Or Unused Credit Amount Carried Forward That Is Earned By A Partnership Or Limited Liability Company Taxed As A Partnership. - Ratified Title
Title
Tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 63 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 77 | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-4 |
2021-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-11 | House | Amended |
2021-05-11 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-05-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21 |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |