SC S0662 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Effective date 01/09/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Effective date 01/09/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Consolidate The School Districts In Orangeburg County Into One School District To Be Known As The Orangeburg County School District; To Provide For The Orderly Transition To A Single School District; To Provide For The Membership Of The Board Of Trustees, Its Election, Powers, And Duties; To Provide That A District Superintendent Is The Chief Operating Officer Of The District And Is Responsible To The Board For The Proper Administration Of All Affairs Of The District And Subject To All Other Provisions Of Law Relating To His Duties
Title
Orangeburg County School Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Effective date 01/09/18 | |
2018-01-09 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-86 Nays-3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Veto overridden Ayes-35 Nays-2 |
2017-06-09 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-06-06 | Ratified R 127 | |
2017-06-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2017-06-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-06-06 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Recalled from Committee on Orangeburg Delegation |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Orangeburg Delegation |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |