SC S0657 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 3 Of Act 802 Of 1954, As Amended, Relating To The Composition Of The Board Of The Chester County Natural Gas Authority, So As To Change The Method Of Appointment; And To Amend Section 5 Of Act 802 Of 1954, Relating To Revenues, So As To Allow The Board To Utilize Net Revenues. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chester County Natural Gas Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06 Act No. 94
2023-04-27 Effective date 04/25/23
2023-04-25 Signed By Governor
2023-04-19 Ratified R 12
2023-04-06HouseRead third time and enrolled
2023-04-05HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2023-04-05HouseRead second time
2023-04-04HouseDelegation report: Favorable Chester Delegation
2023-03-29HouseReferred to Chester Delegation
2023-03-29HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-03-28SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-03-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-23SenateRead second time
2023-03-22SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback