SC S0648 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Effective date 04/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Consolidate Clarendon County School District No. 2 And Clarendon County School District No. 4 Into One School District To Be Known As The Clarendon County School District; To Abolish Clarendon County School District No. 2 And Clarendon County School District No. 4 On July 1, 2022; To Provide That The Clarendon County School District Must Be Governed By A Board Of Trustees Consisting Of Nine Members, Which Initially Must Be Appointed By The Clarendon County Legislative Delegation, And To Provide That, Beginning In 2024, Each Of The Nine Members Of The Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected From A Separate Single-member Election District; To Provide That The Members Of The Clarendon County School District Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected In Nonpartisan Elections Conducted At The Same Time As The 2024 General Election And Every Four Years Thereafter, Except As Provided To Stagger The Members' Terms; To Establish The Board's Powers, Duties, And Responsibilities; To Provide That The District Superintendent Is The Chief Operating Officer Of The District, Is Responsible To The Board For The Proper Administration Of All Affairs Of The District, And Is Subject To All Other Provisions Of Law Relating To His Duties; To Include Interim Millage Provisions For Years 2022 And 2023; And To Provide That, Beginning In 2024, The Clarendon County School District Shall Have Total Fiscal Autonomy. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarendon County School District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15 Effective date 04/12/21
2021-04-12 Signed By Governor
2021-04-08 Ratified R 13
2021-03-17HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-03-16HouseRoll call Yeas-91 Nays-5
2021-03-16HouseRead second time
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2021-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-10SenateRead second time
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback