SC S0637 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 37-22-110, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions Applicable To The Mortgage Lending Laws Of This State, So As To Establish Certain Criteria A Retailer Of Manufactured Or Modular Homes Must Meet To Qualify As An "exempt Person"; And To Amend Section 40-58-20, Relating To Definitions Applicable To The Licensing Of Mortgage Brokers Act, So As To Establish Certain Criteria A Retailer Of Manufactured Or Modular Homes Must Meet To Qualify As An "exempt Person". - Ratified Title
Title
SC Dodd-Frank Conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 173 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 174 | |
2022-05-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2022-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |