SC S0632 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulate Darlington Raceway For Announcing A Second Nascar Cup Series Race, Thereby Doubling The Economic Impact To The State Of South Carolina And Highlighting The Rich History Of This Treasured Attraction In The State, To Acknowledge Nascar Racing As An Integral And Vital Part Of The State And Its Economy, And To Recognize The Weeks Of May 2nd Through May 9th, 2021, And August 29th Through September 5th, 2021, As "darlington Raceway Week" In South Carolina.
Title
Darlington Raceway Weeks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0632&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/632_20210302.htm |