SC S0623 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 38-73-905 So As To Allow For Rate Increases For Certain Types Of Insurance Without Prior Approval; And To Amend Section 38-73-910, Relating To Requirements For A Premium Rate Increase, So As To Differentiate The Requirements For A Premium Rate Increase For Certain Types Of Insurance. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automobile Insurance Filing Limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13 Act No. 33
2021-05-13 Effective date 05/06/21
2021-05-04 Ratified R 46
2021-05-06 Signed By Governor
2021-04-29HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-04-28HouseRoll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
2021-04-28HouseRead second time
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-07SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2021-04-07SenateRead second time
2021-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2021-03-02SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3873905(n/a)See Bill Text
3873910(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback