SC S0614 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Article 1, Chapter 1, Title 25 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Military Code, By Adding Section 25-1-80, To Provide For The Duties And Responsibilities Of The South Carolina Unorganized Militia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Militia, SC unorganized

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-05-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-05-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2022-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-28 Nays-15
2022-05-10SenateRead second time
2022-05-10SenateAmended
2021-03-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25180(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback