SC S0611 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, M.B.Matthews, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, M.B.Matthews, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 4-37-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Establishment Of County Transportation Authorities, So As To Provide That For The Purposes Of Chapter 37, Title 4, The Term "services" Means Transportation Services Such As Mass Transit Systems; To Amend Section 4-37-25, Relating To Transportation Authority Procurement Methods And Requirements, So As To Provide That Transportation Authorities Or Contracting Entities Shall Apply The Same Procurement Methods And Requirements When Procuring Or Contracting For Services And The Operation Of Transportation Services; To Amend Section 4-37-30, Relating To The Imposition Of Sales And Use Taxes Or Tolls To Finance Transportation Facilities Projects Within A County, So As To Provide That Sales And Use Taxes Or Tolls Also May Be Used To Finance Transportation Services.
Title
County transportation authorities
Sponsors
Sen. John Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, M.B.Matthews, Gambrell |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Fanning, Rice |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4389 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 37 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 37 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 37 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0611&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/611_20190305.htm |