SC S0609 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-2-140 So As To Authorize State Agencies And Political Subdivisions That Have Access To Federal Tax Information To Conduct Criminal Background Checks On Its Employees And Contractors. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to tax information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 59
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/17/21
2021-05-17 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 73
2021-05-12HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-95 Nays-1
2021-05-11HouseRead second time
2021-05-11HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-05-06HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2021-04-07SenateRead second time
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122140(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback