SC S0596 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Chapter 1, Title 48 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Pollution Control Act, By Adding Section 48-1-92, To Provide For The Regulation Of Pre-production Plastic By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preproduction plastic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-27HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-22SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-21SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
2021-04-21SenateRead second time
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-04-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48192(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback