SC S0596 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Massey, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Remove The Current Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of John De La Howe School And Devolve The Board's Powers Upon An Interim Board Of Trustees Who Shall Serve Until June 30, 2019 Or Until A Full New Board Of Trustees Is Appointed And Qualified; To Provide That The Interim Board Of Trustees Is Responsible For The Selection, Periodic Evaluation, Retention, And Termination Of The School's President; To Provide For Other Specific Duties Of The Interim Board Of Trustees; And To Direct The Interim Board Of Trustees, In Consultation With The President Of The School, To Review Educational Accreditation And The Past And Current Financial Situation Of The School And Make Recommendations To Direct The School Out Of The Current Financial Crisis, With An Emphasis On Determining The Most Feasible Path The State Must Pursue To Be In Compliance With The Last Will And Testament Of John De La Howe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John De La Howe School Board of Trustees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Massey, Young
2018-05-10HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-97
2018-05-10HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2018-05-10SenateHouse amendment amended
2018-05-10HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2018-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-5
2018-05-09HouseRead second time
2018-05-09HouseAmended
2018-05-03HouseRecalled from Committee on Ways and Means
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-04-18HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-06SenateRead third time and sent to House
2017-04-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-04-05SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2017-04-05SenateRead second time
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable Education
2017-04-05SenatePolled out of committee Education
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback