SC S0593 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 57-25-40 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Applications By A Regional Transit Authority Or Public Transit Operator To Install Commercial Advertisement Benches, To Delete The Expiration Date Of Permits.
Title
Commercial ad benches
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |