SC S0579 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Requests for debate-Rep
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 38-73-920, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Required Rate Filings For Insurers, So As To Provide That Automobile Insurance Rate Increases May Not Be Approved For An Insurer Or Rating Organization Who Has Been Granted A Rate Increase In The Preceding Six Months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rate filings for insurers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2020-09-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-26SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-21SenateRoll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
2019-03-21SenateRead second time
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3873920(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback