SC S0561 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Commission Of The Department Of Transportation, To Increase The Membership Of The Commission To Nine Members, To Provide That Commissioners Shall Be Appointed By The Governor From The State At Large Subject To Screening By The Joint Transportation Review Committee And The Advice And Consent Of The Senate, To Provide That Commissioners Shall Be Appointed To Six-year Terms, And To Clarify The Commission's Duties And Responsibilities; To Amend Section 57-1-410, Relating To The Appointment Of The Secretary Of Transportation, To Provide That The Commission, With The Approval Of The Governor, Shall Appoint A Secretary Of Transportation Subject To The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; To Amend Sections 57-1-720(c) And 57-1-730 To Make Technical And Conforming Amendments Reflecting The Appointment Of Commissioners Rather Than Election Of Commissioners; To Amend Chapter 6, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Office Of Inspector General, To Establish A Division Within The Office Of Inspector General That Is Responsible For The Internal Audit Function Of The Department Of Transportation; And To Repeal Sections 57-1-460 And 57-1-740.
Title
Inspector General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2016-02-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |