SC S0545 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-13-675, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Nongame Fishing Devices Permitted In Certain Bodies Of Water, So As To Allow For The Use Of Set Hooks Within A Certain Portion Of The Santee River, To Establish A Limit For The Number Of Hoop Nets A Commercial Fishing Licensee May Use On The Wateree River, And To Prohibit The Use Of Hoop Nets On The Congaree River. - Ratified Title
Title
Santee River Set Hooks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 57 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 71 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-120 Nays-0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Debate adjourned |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |