SC S0525 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committed to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The Disposition Of Accrued Interest In The Superb Account And The Superb Financial Responsibility Fund, To Repeal The Abolition Of The Environmental Impact Fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superb Account and the Superb Financial Responsibility Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseCommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-27HouseRecalled from Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-14SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-13SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2019-03-13SenateRead second time
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44290(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback