SC S0516 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Identify Certified Teachers And School Support Staff As Mission-critical Workers And Individuals Who Are Eligible For Vaccination Under Phase 1a Of The South Carolina Covid-19 Vaccination Plan, To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Coordinate With The Department Of Education To Implement A Plan That Will Offer The Opportunity To Certified Teachers And School Support Staff To Be Fully Vaccinated Within Thirty Days Of The Effective Date Of This Joint Resolution, To Provide That Every School District Must Offer Five-day, In-person Classroom Instruction To Students No Later Than Two Weeks After Certified Teachers And Support Staff Have Been Offered The Opportunity To Be Fully Vaccinated, And To Provide That The Department Of Health And Environmental Control Must Ensure That All South Carolina Residents Who Are Eligible Under Phase 1a Of The South Carolina Covid-19 Vaccination Plan Who Have Received A First Vaccine Dose As Of The Effective Date Of This Joint Resolution Are Offered The Opportunity For Full Vaccination Within The Appropriate Recommended Time Period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19, teacher vaccinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment #11 (Y: 2 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 8 (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-09SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2021-02-09SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-09SenateAmended
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-04SenateAmended
2021-02-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Same As/Similar To

S0520 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
H3838 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
H3858 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
H3886 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback