SC S0515 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 280 Of 2018, Relating To The Orangeburg County School District, So As To Eliminate The Prohibition Against Holding Certain School Closure Referendums At The Same Time As A School Bond Referendum, To Provide That Certain Procedures Regarding The Closure Of An Orangeburg County Elementary, Middle, Or High School Do Not Apply If The Board Of Trustees Determines That A Building Or Structure Is An Imminent Threat To The Health Or Safety Of Students Or Staff, Or That The Needed Upgrades And Repairs To Maintain A Building Or Structure Are Economically Unfeasible; And To Revise The Orangeburg County School District's Millage Levy For Fiscal Years 2021-2022 And 2022-2023. - Ratified Title
Title
Orangeburg County School District Trustees' duty to adopt attendance zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 112 | |
2021-04-23 | Effective date 04/21/21 | |
2021-04-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Ratified R 23 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Amended |
2021-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable Orangeburg Delegation |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Orangeburg Delegation |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |