SC S0514 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 140 Of Chapter 3, Title 56, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Issuance Of Clemson University 2016 Football National Champions Special License Plates By The Department Of Motor Vehicles, So As To Provide For The Issuance Of "clemson University 2018 Football National Champions" Special License Plates By The Department Of Motor Vehicles. - Ratified Title
Title
Special License Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Act No. 22 | |
2019-05-03 | Effective date 04/26/19 | |
2019-04-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Ratified R 34 | |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |