SC S0510 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-15)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 56-15-10, As Amended Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions For The Regulation Of Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, And Dealers, So As To Revise The Definition Of Certain Terms And Provide Additional Terms And Their Definitions; By Adding Section 56-15-35, So As To Provide For The Handling Of Certain Consumer Data By Franchisors, Manufacturers, Distributors, Or Third Party Affiliates; To Amend Section 56-15-40, Relating To Specific Acts Deemed Unfair Methods Of Competition And Unfair Or Deceptive Acts Or Practices Regarding Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, And Dealers, So As To Define Certain Terms, Revise The Provisions Relating To Certain Entities Taking Adverse Actions Against A Dealer For Offering Or Declining To Offer Promotions, Service Contracts, Debt Cancellation Agreements, Maintenance Agreements, Or Other Similar Products, Terminating Or Canceling A Franchise Or Selling Agreements To A Dealer Without Due Cause, And Provide That Certain Additional Conduct Constitutes A Violation Of This Section; To Amend Section 56-15-45, Relating To Ownership, Operation Or Control Of Competing Dealerships By Manufacturers Or Franchisors, So As To Provide For A Date Change, To Delete Qualifications For An Exemption, And To Provide A Manufacturer May Not Lease Or Enter Into Subscription Agreements Except To A New Dealer Holding Franchises In The Line Make That Includes The Vehicles; To Amend Section 56-15-46, Relating To The Notice Of Intent To Establish Or Relocate Competing Dealerships, So As To Revise The Radius That Pertains To The Area In Which Franchisors Intend To Establish New Dealerships Near An Existing Dealership, Add A Time Requirement For Notice, And Revise The Circumstances For Which This Section Does Not Apply; To Amend Section 56-15-50, Relating To The Requirement That Manufacturers Must Specify Delivery And Preparation Obligations Of Dealers, Filing Of Copy Of Obligations, And Schedule Of Compensation, So As To Provide Manufacturers And Franchisors Shall Indemnify And Hold Harmless Its Franchised Dealers Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 56-15-60, Relating To The Fulfillment Of Warranty Agreements And A Dealer's Claims For Compensation, So As To Revise The Provisions Relating To Warranty Agreements That Affect Certain Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Dealers, Distributors, Factory Branches, And Distributor Branches; To Amend Section 56-15-65, Relating To Requirements For Changes Of Location Or Alteration Of Dealerships, So As To Provide Certain Conduct By Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Representatives, Or Distributor Representatives Is A Violation Of This Section; To Amend Section 56-15-70, Relating To Certain Unreasonable Restrictions On Dealers Or Franchisees That Are Unlawful, So As To Provide Additional Restrictions That Are Unlawful; To Amend Section 56-15-90, Relating To The Failure To Renew, The Termination Or Restriction Of Transfers Of A Franchise, And Determining Reasonable Compensation For The Value Of Dealership Franchises, So As To Revise The Provisions Relating To The Determination Of Fair And Reasonable Compensation For Businesses; And To Amend Section 56-15-140, Relating To Venue For Actions Relating To The Regulation Of Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, And Dealers, So As To Provide The Venue Is In The State Courts In South Carolina. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulations of motor vehicles manufacturers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13 Act No. 31
2021-05-13 Effective date 08/4/21
2021-05-04 Ratified R 44
2021-05-06 Signed By Governor
2021-04-28SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2021-04-28SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2021-04-28HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2021-04-27HouseRoll call Yeas-xxx Nays-xxx
2021-04-27HouseRead second time
2021-04-27HouseAmended
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-03SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-03-02SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2021-03-02SenateRead second time
2021-03-02SenateAmended
2021-02-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561510(n/a)See Bill Text
5615140(n/a)See Bill Text
561535(n/a)See Bill Text
561540(n/a)See Bill Text
561545(n/a)See Bill Text
561546(n/a)See Bill Text
561550(n/a)See Bill Text
561560(n/a)See Bill Text
561565(n/a)See Bill Text
561570(n/a)See Bill Text
561590(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback