SC S0500 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-3-290, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Persons And Activities Exempt From Licensure Or Regulation By The Board Of Architectural Examiners, So As To Revise An Exemption For The Preparation Of Plans And Specifications For Certain Family Dwellings. - Ratified Title
Title
Architectural Examiners Board
Sponsors
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Sen. Joshua Kimbrell [R] | Sen. Karl Allen [D] |
Sen. Vernon Stephens [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 54 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 68 | |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |