SC S0486 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 4 To Title 26 So As To Enact The "south Carolina Remote Online Notarization Act", To Provide A Citation, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Provide For The Applicability Of The Chapter, To Provide The Secretary Of State By Rule Shall Develop And Maintain Standards For Credential Analysis And Identity Proofing And To Provide Requirements For The Development Of These Standards, To Provide Notaries Public Commissioned In This State May Register As Remote Online Notaries Public Upon Satisfying Certain Requirements, To Enumerate Notarial Acts That May Be Performed By Remote Online Notaries Using Electronic Technology, To Provide Requirements For Conducting Online Notarial Acts, To Provide Remote Online Notaries Public May Charge Fees For Performing Remote Online Notarial Acts, To Provide Liability, Sanctions, And Remedies For The Improper Performance Of Remote Online Notarial Acts Or For Providing False Or Misleading Information In Registering To Perform Remote Online Notarial Acts Are The Same As Provided By Law For The Improper Performance Of Nonelectronic Notarial Acts, To Specify Certain Recording Requirements That Are Considered Satisfied By Remote Notarial Acts, And To Provide Remote Online Notary Public Applications Will Not Be Accepted For Processing Until The Administrative Rules Are In Effect And Vendors Of Technology Are Approved By The Secretary Of State, Among Other Things.
Title
SC Remote Online Notarization Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |