SC S0479 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Welcome The National Commander Of The American Legion, The Honorable Brett Reistad, To South Carolina And To Invite Him To Address The General Assembly In Joint Session In The Chamber Of The South Carolina House Of Representatives At 12:30 P.m. On Wednesday, March 6, 2019.
Title
Honorable Brett Reistad
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Operations and Management |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Polled out of committee Operations and Management |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |