SC S0464 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 58-31-20 Of The 1976 South Carolina Code Of Laws To Provide A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Public Service Authority Shall Not Be Appointed For More Than Two Unexpired Consecutive Terms And For Education And Experience Requirements For A Board Member; To Add Section 58-31-225 To Provide That The Office Of Regulatory Staff Has Authority To Make Inspections, Audits And Examinations Of The Public Service Authority For Electric And Water Rates; To Amend Section 58-31-380 To Establish A Process To Receive Public Comment And A Public Hearing In Setting Electric Rates, And For The Office Of Regulatory Staff To Review The Proposed Rates And Comment Before The Rates Go Into Effect; To Amend Section 58-33-20 To Include The Public Service Authority In The Requirements For Utility Facility Siting; To Amend Section 58-37-40 To Delete Subsection (a)(3); And To Add Section 58-37-45 To Require The South Carolina Public Service Authority To Submit An Integrated Resource Plan To The Public Service Commission And To Provide For Plan Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table #10 (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Am. #6 (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateRead second time
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-20SenateDebate interrupted
2021-04-20SenateAmended
2021-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley, Harpootlian, Adams
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
583120(n/a)See Bill Text
5831225(n/a)See Bill Text
5831380(n/a)See Bill Text
583320(n/a)See Bill Text
583740(n/a)See Bill Text
583745(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback