SC S0463 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The South Carolina Law Enforcement Division To Retain Fingerprints For Use In Identification Purposes
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 55 | |
2017-05-26 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 81 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |