SC S0457 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 50-21-870(b)(6) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Personal Watercraft And Boating Safety, To Increase Distance Limits Between A Watercraft Operating In Excess Of Idle Speed Upon Certain Waters Of This State And A Moored Or Anchored Vessel, Wharf, Dock, Bulkhead, Pier, Or Person In The Water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watercraft

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2021-03-03SenateRead second time
2021-03-03SenateAmended
2021-02-25SenateAmended
2021-02-25SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0364 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
S0387 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
H3308 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-2-21

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5021870(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback