SC S0454 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 40-33-43, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Authorized Provision Of Medications By Unlicensed Persons In Community Residential Facilities, So As To Extend These Provisions To Correctional Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medications, authorized provisions by unlicensed persons in community residential facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-04SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-03SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2021-02-03SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2021-01-28SenatePolled out of committee Medical Affairs
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3697 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403343(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback