SC S0444 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1-7-330, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Attendance At Circuit Court And Preparation And Publication Of The Docket, So As To Clarify The Role Of The Circuit Solicitor In The Development, Dissemination, And Execution Of The General Sessions Court Docket Plan; To Provide That The Ability Of The Circuit Solicitor To Administer The Docket May Not Interfere With A Defendant's Right To A Speedy Trial; To Allow For The Circuit Court To Rule On Cases And Controversies Arising From The Administration Of The Docket; And To Preserve All Crime Victims' Constitutional Rights.
Title
Circuit court docket
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Senn, Talley |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3827 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis