SC S0435 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 38-43-25 So As To Authorize The Director Of The Department Of Insurance To Issue A Limited Lines Travel Insurance Producer License; To Amend Section 38-1-20, As Amended, Relating To Definitions Applicable To Title 38, So As To Delete The Definition Of "travel Insurance" And To Add Travel Insurance To The Definition Of "marine Insurance"; And To Amend Article 6 Of Chapter 43, Title 38, Relating To Limited Lines Travel Insurance, So As To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide That Travel Insurance Must Be Classified And Filed As Inland Marine Insurance Subject To Certain Exceptions, To Authorize The Director Of The Department Of Insurance To Establish A Travel Insurance Producer License And Establish Certain Requirements For An Applicant, To Assess A Premium Tax On Travel Insurance Premiums And Establish Certain Reporting Requirements, To Establish Certain Requirements For Travel Protection Plans, To Provide Certain Sales Practices For Travel Insurers, To Establish Certain Licensing Requirements For Travel Administrators For Travel Insurance, And To Authorize The Director To Promulgate Regulations. - Ratified Title
Title
Limited lines of travel insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 50 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 63 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |